CROSSLEY AND PORTER ORPHAN HOME AND SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of special benefits for the school conducted at the Charity's property; promotion of education of persons under 25 residing within the Borough of Calderdale or who have attended any school or former school of the Charity; relief of hardship or promotion of education of persons who have lost one or both parents (with preference to persons residing within the former County of York
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Calderdale
Governance
- 27 June 1961: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHARLES MARTIN BENEDICT CROSSLEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN JOHN EGGLETON | Trustee | 05 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Baines MBE | Trustee | 03 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN FRANCIS BREARLEY FORD | Trustee | 31 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Anne CROSSLEY | Trustee | 03 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr STEVEN CLAPCOTE | Trustee | 14 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
DOCTOR STEPHEN THORNBER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALEXANDRA JULIA CROSSLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHARLES CHRISTOPHER HODGSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
PETER MORTIMER CROSSLEY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.33k | £38.98k | £38.25k | £43.29k | £47.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.43k | £49.66k | £57.92k | £44.72k | £43.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30 JANUARY 1968, ROYAL CHARTERS DATED 11 SEPTEMBER 1868 AND 30 JANUARY 1887 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 20 DECEMBER 1918, 29 DECEMBER 1960 AND 20 JUNE 1988 AND BY A LETTER OF THE COMMISSION DATED 30 APRIL 1992 AS AMENDED BY TRUST MODIFICATION ORDER 19/12/2012
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH PERIOD AS THE PROPERTY BELONGING TO THE CHARITY FORMERLY USED AS A VOLUNTARY SCHOOL WITHIN THE EDUCATION ACTS 1944-1986 (“THE PROPERTY”) SHALL BE USED AND OCCUPIED AS AN ACADEMY PURSUANT TO THE ACADEMIES ACT 2010 THE PROPERTY SHALL BE APPROPRIATED AND USED AS SUCH AN ACADEMY TO BE KNOWN AS THE CROSSLEY HEATH ACADEMY (OR BY SUCH OTHER NAME AS THE GOVERNING BODY OF SUCH ACADEMY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE) 5 (1) (A) AS TO SUCH SUM AS THE TRUSTEE MAY DETERMINE NOT EXCEEDING •24,000 OR ONE FIFTH OF SUCH INCOME (WHICHEVER IS THE GREATER), OR SUCH OTHER SUM AS THE CHARITY COMMISSION MAY FROM TIME TO TIME APPROVE, IN PROVIDING SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS FOR THE CROSSLEY HEATH ACADEMY AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE AGREED BETWEEN THE TRUSTEE AND THE GOVERNORS OF THE SCHOOL; (1) (B) AS TO SUCH SUM AS THE TRUSTEE MAY DETERMINE NOT EXCEEDING •16,000 OR THREE TENTHS OF SUCH INCOME (WHICHEVER IS THE GREATER), OR SUCH OTHER SUM AS THE CHARITY COMMISSION MAY FROM TIME TO TIME APPROVE, IN PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO OR WHOSE PARENTS ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE BOROUGH COUNCIL OF CALDERDALE OR WHO HAVE AT ANY TIME ATTENDED AS A PUPIL AT ANY SCHOOL OR FORMER SCHOOL OF THE CHARITY AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING - (I) IN AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, EXHIBITIONS, BURSARIES, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OF EDUCATION, OR OTHER INSTITUTION OF FURTHER (INCLUDING PROFESSIONAL AND TECHNICAL) EDUCATION APPROVED FOR THE PURPOSE BY THE TRUSTEE; (II) IN PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, OUTFITS, CLOTHING, TOOLS, INSTRUMENTS OR BOOKS TO ASSIST SUCH PERSONS TO PURSUE THEIR EDUCATION (INCLUDING THE STUDY OF MUSIC AND OTHER ARTS), TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE THEREOF, OR TO PREPARE FOR OR ENTER A PROFESSION, TRADE, OCCUPATION OR SERVICE ON LEAVING SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY, OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT. (1) (C) AS TO THE RESIDUE OF SUCH INCOME, FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS WHO HAVE LOST EITHER BOTH PARENTS OR ONE PARENT, OR WHOSE PARENTS ARE LIVING TEMPORARILY OR PERMANENTLY APART, PREFERENCE BEING GIVEN TO SUCH PERSONS AS AFORESAID WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE FORMER COUNTY OF YORK, IN ONE OR BOTH OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS: (I) IN RELIEVING SUCH PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS; (II) IN PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF CALDERDALE
Linked charities
- 27 June 1961 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hodgson Hey Ltd
South Lane
ELLAND
West Yorkshire
HX5 0HG
- Phone:
- 07841377410
- Email:
- will@hodgsonhey.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window