JOHN SMYTH EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 529260
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Limited financial assistance to those undertaking education & training within the boundaries of the parish.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024

Total income: £2,748
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of Wakefield

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 February 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • JOHN SMYTH CHARITY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Louise Tinniswood Trustee 01 March 2016
ELEEMOSYNARY CHARITY OF JOHN SMYTH
Received: On time
FREESTON AND SAGAR'S ALMSHOUSES
Received: 28 days late
ANTHONY BRADSHAW Trustee 07 June 2014
ELEEMOSYNARY CHARITY OF JOHN SMYTH
Received: On time
MAGGIE VASEY Trustee 11 March 2012
ELEEMOSYNARY CHARITY OF JOHN SMYTH
Received: On time
VERONICA SMITH Trustee
ELEEMOSYNARY CHARITY OF JOHN SMYTH
Received: On time
ANN ELIZABETH TOSTA Trustee
ELEEMOSYNARY CHARITY OF JOHN SMYTH
Received: On time
YOUNG LIVES CONSORTIUM
Received: On time
ST GEORGE'S LUPSET LTD
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £2.49k £121 £1 £2.62k £2.75k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £250 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 04 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2023 02 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 29 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 22 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 03 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
93 Park Avenue
Kirkthorpe
Wakefield
WF1 5TQ
Phone:
01924891570
Website:

No information available