Financial history THE BROTHERTON SCIENCE SCHOLARSHIP

Charity Number: 529284
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £2.30k £2.32k £1.12k £347 £2.45k
Total expenditure £500 £500 £500 £1.50k £500
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A