THE HORTON-IN-RIBBLESDALE EXHIBITION FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Horton in Ribblesdale CofE (VA) Primary School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 11 November 1967: Standard registration
- 18 July 2018: Funds received from 1048250 HORTON-IN-RIBBLESDALE C OF E SCHOOL FUND
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Richard Mounsey | Chair | 30 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Richard Blackburn | Trustee | 10 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Margaret Ireton | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev STEPHEN DAWSON | Trustee | 29 April 2014 |
|
|||||
JEANETTE DAVIDSON | Trustee | 22 July 2012 |
|
|||||
JIM DAVIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NEIL JACKSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.08k | £1.73k | £2.34k | £6.94k | £1.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.10k | £2.10k | £2.55k | £4.10k | £2.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 10 NOVEMBER 1915 AS VARIED BY SCHEME DATED 15 APRIL 1970
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF EXHIBITIONS TENABLE AT ANY SECONDARY SCHOOL OR ANY UNIVERSITY AND OTHER EXHIBITIONS FOR TEACHERS TRAINING AND TECHNICAL EDUCATION. THE EXHIBITIONS TO BE GRANTED TO CANDIDATES ON GROUNDS OF MERIT AND ABILITY. OTHER PAYMENTS FOR HIGHER EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HORTON IN RIBBLESDALE
Contact information
- Address:
-
HORTON IN RIBBLESDALE PRIMARY
HORTON IN RIBBLESDALE SETTLE
N YORKS
BD24 0EX
- Phone:
- 01729860435
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window