Financial history AYSGARTH SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 529538
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £3.77m £3.62m £4.12m £3.96m £4.27m
Total expenditure £3.71m £3.65m £4.18m £4.64m £4.69m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £25.26k £24.77k £93.34k £7.88k £9.95k
Income - Other trading activities £647 £1.81k £43.98k £47.46k £53.09k
Income - Charitable activities £3.67m £3.55m £3.97m £3.88m £4.06m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.33k £158 £1.17k £7.80k £22.12k
Income - Other £74.45k £41.24k £14.83k £13.88k £122.50k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.71m £3.64m £4.11m £4.61m £4.63m
Expenditure - Raising funds £846 £4.79k £47.31k £5.50k £39.48k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £4.59k £5.96k £6.55k £6.30k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £187 £77 £24.54k £27.09k £23.02k