Financial history WILSON-BARKWORTH FUND

Charity number: 529811
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £4.95k £5.05k £5.11k £5.13k £5.20k
Total expenditure £10.20k £7.00k £6.98k £6.96k £2.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A