WILSON-BARKWORTH FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The income of the charity is applied in paying bursaries for the education at the college of St Mary Winchester of boys being sons of persons in need of monetary assistance who either are or have been members of the Royal College of Surgeons (England) or persons who either are or have been holders of an incumbency of the Church of England in England or Wales.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 November 1963: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
George Holtby | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
JOHN DAVID BARSTOW | Trustee | 05 April 2019 |
|
|||||
JOHN HOLTBY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.95k | £5.05k | £5.11k | £5.13k | £5.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.20k | £7.00k | £6.98k | £6.96k | £2.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 07 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 17 JANUARY 1938 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 16 FEBRUARY 1956
Charitable objects
THE YEARLY INCOME OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE APPLIED BY THE TRUSTEES IN MAKING PAYMENTS OF SUCH AMOUNTS AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DECIDE FROM TIME TO TIME THE PURPOSE OF DEFRAYING THE WHOLE OR PART OF THE EXPENSES OF THE EDUCATION AT THE COLLEGE OF SAINT MARY WINCHESTER OF ONE OR MORE BOYS BEING SONS OF PERSONS OF ONE OR OTHER OF THE FOLLOWING KINDS NAMELY: (A) PERSONS WHO EITHER ARE OR HAVE BEEN MEMBERS OF THE ROYAL COLLEGE OF SURGEONS (ENGLAND) (B) PERSONS WHO EITHER ARE OR HAVE BEEN HOLDERS OF AN INCUMBENCY OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE CITY AND COUNTY OF KINGSTON UPON HULL OR THE EAST RIDING OF THE COUNTY OF YORK AND WHO IF LIVING PROFESS OR IF DEAD ARE BELIEVED TO HAVE ENTERTAINED WHAT ARE KNOWN AS STRICT EVANGELICAL VIEWS (C) PROVIDED THAT IF THERE ARE NOT SUFFICIENT CANDIDATES BEING SONS OF THE PERSONS DESCRIBED IN THE FOREGOING PARAGRAPH (D) THE CANDIDATES MAY INCLUDE SONS OF PERSONS WHO EITHER ARE OR WHO HAVE BEEN HOLDERS OF AN INCUMBENCY OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND OR WALES AND WHO IF LIVING PROFESS OR IF DEAD ARE BELIEVED TO HAVE ENTERTAINED WHAT ARE KNOWN AS STRICT EVANGELICAL VIEWS.
Area of benefit
KINGSTON UPON HULL E RIDING OF YORKS. NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O GRAYS
DUNCOMBE PLACE
YORK
YO1 7DY
- Phone:
- 01904634771
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window