FRIENDS OF YSGOL CRUG GLAS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AMONGST THE PUPILS OF YSGOL CRUG GLAS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AT THE SCHOOL, NOT USUALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL AUTHORITY, AND MAY - FOSTER MORE EXTENDED RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF, PARENTS & OTHERS - ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING IT - HELP PROVIDE FACILITIES TO MEET THE SPECIAL NEEDS OF THE PUPILS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- City Of Swansea
Governance
- 22 November 1988: Standard registration
- HOME SCHOOL ASSOCIATION OF DYFATTY SCHOOL (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ishbel Hansen | Chair | 12 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sian Channon | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sian Roberts Treasurer | Trustee | 16 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
MR J.Q. HAWKINS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.97k | £12.45k | £2.75k | £1.05k | £6.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.43k | £21.51k | £2.00k | £133.15k | £2.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 SEPTEMBER 1986 AS AMENDED 19 SEPTEMBER 1988, 15 JANUARY 1996, 12 APRIL 2000 AND 8 MARCH 2001
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AMONGST THE HANDICAPPED CHILDREN AT DYFATTY SPECIAL SCHOOL BY ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL AUTHORITY).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ysgol Crug Glas
Croft Street
Swansea
SA1 1QA
- Phone:
- 01792652388
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window