Financial history COVENTRY SPORTS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 700409
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.17m £5.14m £8.55m £10.11m £11.34m
Total expenditure £6.60m £5.23m £7.87m £9.84m £10.75m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £94.58k N/A £186.93k £384.29k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £262.12k £2.59m £682.21k £188.03k £380.35k
Income - Other trading activities £218.80k £129.95k £188.00k £204.00k £297.99k
Income - Charitable activities £5.64m £2.37m £7.56m £9.64m £10.51m
Income - Endowments £262.12k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £44.85k £47.69k £118.74k £71.37k £152.43k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.60m £5.23m £7.86m £9.81m £10.67m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £8.46k £13.75k £15.60k
Expenditure - Governance £102.61k £10.81k £30.84k £30.01k £65.19k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £15.60k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £15.38k £61.33k