Financial history UPTON JAZZ ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 700468
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £15.67k £5.56k £25.77k £25.13k £24.93k
Total expenditure £15.98k £8.98k £22.60k £20.80k £20.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £5.50k £1.33k £1.50k