COMMUNITY FOUNDATION SERVING TYNE & WEAR AND NORTHUMBERLAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Community Foundation is a generalist grantmaker to a wide range of community groups predominantly in the area of Tyne & Wear and Northumberland. Its vision is effective giving, thriving communities and enriched lives. The predominant activity is grantmaking but the Community Foundation also devotes resources to development and donor education which aim to increase local philanthropy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£9,401,890
Donations and legacies | £7.03m | |
Charitable activities | £45.99k | |
Other trading activities | £11.09k | |
Investments | £2.31m | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£9,989,983
Raising funds | £588.34k | |
Charitable activities | £9.40m | |
Other | £0 |
£7,607,455 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £789,432 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £588.34k | |
Charitable expenditure | £9.40m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £588.34k | |
Charitable expenditure | £9.40m | |
Retained for future use | £7.02m |
People

24 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 01 August 1988: Standard registration
- 04 July 2011: Funds received from 284999 THE ENID BLYTON TRUST FOR CHILDREN
- 11 February 2014: Funds received from 509949 RUTHERFORD SCHOOL ROBERT WOOD TRUST
- 14 March 2019: Funds received from 509714 THE ROYAL JUBILEE EDUCATIONAL CHARITY FOR GIRLS
- 11 November 2019: Funds received from 230711 BERWICK UPON TWEED NURSING AMENITIES FUND
- 15 September 2020: Funds received from 1113193 LIFESPAN COMPLEMENTARY
- 15 October 2020: Funds received from 225429 NORTHUMBERLAND VILLAGE HOMES TRUST
- 19 January 2021: Funds received from 227165-4 MRS DOROTHY SMITH BEQUEST
- 19 January 2021: Funds received from 227165-2 ERNEST EDWIN CHARLTON
- 19 January 2021: Funds received from 227165-1 THE ARMSTRONG ATKINSON FUND
- 19 January 2021: Funds received from 227165 NEWCASTLE DISPENSARY RELIEF IN SICKNESS CHARITY
- 07 April 2022: Funds received from 1150142 ROOM FOR YOU
- 15 December 2022: Funds received from 1152368 THE JOYCE TRUST
- 18 January 2023: Funds received from 295313 THE BILL AND MAY HODGSON CHARITABLE TRUST
- 24 September 2024: Funds received from 1169341 THE EXCHANGE NORTH TYNESIDE LIMITED
- COMMUNITY FOUNDATION (Working name)
- TYNE & WEAR FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip James Moorhouse | Chair | 18 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Pamela Smith | Trustee | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Glendinning | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stella Simbo | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Standfield | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colin Thompson Hewitt | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Michael Keith Brodie | Trustee | 10 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Wendy Baker | Trustee | 18 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Claire Malcolm | Trustee | 12 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Laura Elizabeth Warwick | Trustee | 07 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Neil Farquhar | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Ms Lucy Winskell OBE DL | Trustee | 07 December 2016 |
|
|||||
Andrew Haigh | Trustee | 07 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.76m | £9.45m | £9.41m | £7.91m | £10.13m | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.12m | £8.50m | £10.00m | £9.30m | £9.99m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £775.44k | £693.63k | £965.29k | £649.37k | £789.43k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £7.70m | £8.48m | £4.49m | £3.66m | £7.03m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £8.50k | £2.00k | £0 | £4.50k | £11.09k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £52.30k | £54.46k | £39.33k | £42.45k | £45.99k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £4.93m | £3.78m | £1.32m | £874.49k | £2.08m | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.30m | £1.93m | £1.84m | £2.16m | £2.31m | |
|
Income - Other | £2.64m | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £46.06k | £2.87m | £1.37k | £10.20k | £1.42m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £7.59m | £8.04m | £9.51m | £8.80m | £9.40m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £529.03k | £455.01k | £488.38k | £501.01k | £588.34k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £80.28k | £77.78k | £67.47k | £92.50k | £93.46k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £6.55m | £7.14m | £8.54m | £7.63m | £8.27m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £254.18k | £236.91k | £266.39k | £240.74k | £266.52k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £727.80k | £699.82k | £685.88k | £657.89k | £635.04k | |
|
Long-term investments | £76.55m | £91.21m | £96.52m | £89.87m | £95.78m | |
|
Other assets | £8.54m | £12.00m | £9.44m | £7.80m | £8.88m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £2.27m | £1.86m | £2.55m | £2.15m | £2.10m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04 JUL 1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09 SEP 1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 OCT 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 SEP 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21 NOV 2018 as amended on 13 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, IN THE AREA OF TYNE AND WEAR AND NORTHUMBERLAND: (A) TO PROMOTE AND SUPPORT THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR DISADVANTAGE; (B) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT HEALTH; (C) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC; (D) FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN EACH CASE AS THE DIRECTORS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
TYNE AND WEAR AND NORTHUMBERLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
Community Foundation
Philanthropy House
Woodbine Road
Gosforth
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE3 1DD
- Phone:
- 01912220945
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window