HORTON VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Venue to meet the need of the local and wider community user groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 19 October 1988: Standard registration
- HORTON VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROGER BALL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Suzanne Clair Wheeldon | Trustee | 11 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emily Bloor | Trustee | 11 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Moss | Trustee | 11 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Howard Frank Beswick | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Susan Julia Clulow | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
NORMA HAWKINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EILEEN HOUGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NEIL ANDERTON YATES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.98k | £31.80k | £27.28k | £62.01k | £15.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.13k | £22.23k | £18.01k | £46.32k | £19.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.27k | £22.60k | £31.75k | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 31 August 2024 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 12 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 12 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 16 November 2022 | 109 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 16 November 2022 | 109 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 09 October 2020 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19 DECEMBER 1987
Charitable objects
PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE OF INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF HORTON IN THE COUNTY OF STAFFORDSHIRE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDTIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HORTON STAFFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Horton Village hall
Horton
LEEK
Staffordshire
ST13 8PU
- Phone:
- 01538 306366
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window