Financial history CROSBY RAVENSWORTH UNITED SCHOOLS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 700876
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £23.67k £16.79k £16.98k £16.70k £17.60k
Total expenditure £8.76k £6.82k £5.37k £10.50k £4.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A