Accounts and annual returns STOKE ALDERMOOR COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 701099
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 15 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 January 2025 350 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 20 January 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 March 2022 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 March 2022 42 days late
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 15 December 2020 On Time