Financial history STOKE ALDERMOOR COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 701099
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £52.82k £136.70k £55.32k £0 £0
Total expenditure £54.75k £79.13k £79.15k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £19.79k N/A N/A