THE QUEENSWAY MEDICAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity Trust is solely for donations received from patients & their relatives. Funds are used for equipment for patient services and the education and training of staff in order to utilise such equipment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lancashire
Governance
- 14 July 1989: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patricia Jayne Clark | Trustee | 12 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Douglas Tweedy | Trustee | 12 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Greenwood | Trustee | 13 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard Ronald Rhodes | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £211 | £243 | £12 | £705 | £2.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £635 | £60 | £60 | £0 | £85 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 22 July 2024 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 07 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 22 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 01 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED THE 1 JULY 1989 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 09 AUG 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY SHALL NOW BE THE RELIEF OF ILL HEALTH BY PROVIDING CARE AND MEDICAL PROVISION INCLUDING EDUCATION AND TRAINING AND THE SUPPLY AND MAINTENANCE OF AIDS FOR THE BENEFIT OF PATIENTS IN NEED WHO ARE REGISTERED WITH QUEENSWAY MEDICAL CENTRE BEYOND THE PROVISION OF THAT WHICH IS AVAILABLE ON THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE”
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Queensway Medical Centre
Queensway
POULTON-LE-FYLDE
FY6 7ST
- Phone:
- 01253890219
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window