WEST FELTON MEMORIAL HALL (ALSO KNOWN AS WEST FELTON VILLAGE HALL)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village Hall providing community access to a range of activities, including WI, childrens' events, social occasions, sports clubs, local college classes, fund raising venue for other institutions within the community, etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Shropshire
Governance
- 02 November 1989: Standard registration
- WEST FELTON VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- FELTON AND DISTRICT MEMORIAL HALL (Previous name)
- WEST FELTON AND DISTRICT MEMORIAL HALL (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID CURTIS | Chair | 25 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Hicks | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deryck Lindsey | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
ALISON SACRE | Trustee | 25 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Victoria George | Trustee | 10 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
IAN WALKER | Trustee | 12 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
EILEEN EUNICE HANMER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HILARY CARYL ILES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE CURTIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAIN ROBERT BUTLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARIAN HESKETH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.71k | £21.36k | £14.98k | £6.93k | £10.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.92k | £5.81k | £6.80k | £11.00k | £14.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.43k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 27 MAR 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
WEST FELTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
West Felton Memorial Hall
The Cross
West Felton
OSWESTRY
Shropshire
SY11 4EH
- Phone:
- 01691610086
- Email:
- westfeltonhall@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window