Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF LANCASTER LOYNE TRUST FUND

Charity number: 702889
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £6.65k £4.67k £18.47k £10.74k £7.80k
Total expenditure £5.14k £3.45k £18.34k £9.27k £9.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A