Charity overview THOMAS STRANSHAM
Charity number: 212165-7
Removed charity
Governing document
WILL 6TH OCTOBER 1584 (P.R. 30 PAGE 208) AND SCHEMES OF THE 18TH DECEMBER 1896 AND 15TH DECEMBER 1961
Charitable objects
GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF FAVERSHAM
Registration history
- 26 June 1968: Standard registration
- 18 February 1995: Removed
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.