THE INTERNATIONAL CHURCHILL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We promote the life and many achievements of Winston Churchill through educational programmes and competitions, via our quarterly journal, and by conferences, visits to Churchill related sites, and talks. There is a particular emphasis on reaching out to the younger generation by providing them with educational opportunities to learn more about the man.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Scotland
Governance
- 01 September 1988: Standard registration
- THE CHURCHILL CENTRE - UNITED KINGDOM (Previous name)
- THE INTERNATIONAL CHURCHILL SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THE LORD MARLAND | Chair | 27 May 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
Derek John Greenwell | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Matthew McGrath | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Stephen Poss | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Ambassador ret. Mitchell Reiss | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Philip Boeckman | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Jennie Churchill | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Scott Marshall Johnson | Trustee | 08 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
LORD ANDREW ROBERTS OF BELGRAVIA | Trustee | 07 June 2015 |
|
|||||||||
ROBERT STEPHEN RUBIN OBE | Trustee | 22 May 2012 |
|
|||||||||
RANDOLPH LEONARD SPENCER CHURCHILL | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
LAURENCE STEPHEN GELLER CBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £154.92k | £61.18k | £131.20k | £153.19k | £97.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.96k | £69.79k | £144.81k | £180.21k | £72.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 06 November 2023 | 129 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 06 November 2023 | 129 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 November 2022 | 137 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 14 November 2022 | 137 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 11 October 2021 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 11 October 2021 | 103 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 25/07/1988 AS AMENDED ON 19/04/2008 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 10/07/2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE LIFE AND LEGACY OF SIR WINSTON CHURCHILL FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) CREATING, IMPLEMENTING OR SUPPORTING PROGRAMMES IN HIS NAME OR THAT SUPPORT HIS VALUES THAT ADVANCE EDUCATION, ENCOURAGE PUBLIC SERVICE, SUPPORT DEMOCRATIC FREEDOMS, DEVELOP PUBLIC SPEAKING, NURTURE LEADERSHIP AND/OR FOSTER SELF EXPRESSION; (B) PUBLICLY RECOGNISING, HONOURING AND REWARDING THE CHURCHILLIAN VALUES OF BRAVERY, CREATIVITY, ORATORY AND LEADERSHIP; (C) SUPPORTING THE WORK OF THE CHURCHILL SITES, MUSEUMS AND CHARITIES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND BEYOND, SO AS TO HELP MAINTAIN THE RICH DIVERSITY OF HIS LIVING LEGACY; AND (D) ENCOURAGING WIDER AWARNESS OF THE HISTORIC ROLE PLAYED BY SIR WINSTON CHURCHILL BY STAGING OR SUPPORTING LECTURES, SYMPOSIA, CONFERENCES AND EXHIBITIONS, AND BY DEVELOPING PUBLICATIONS AND ON-LINE RESOURCES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR
THE INTERNATIONAL CHURCHILL SOCIETY
CHURCHILL COLLEGE
CAMBRIDGE
CB3 0DS
- Phone:
- 01223331646
- Email:
- TCC.Membership@chu.cam.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window