WAKEFIELD TRUST

Charity number: 800079
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Trust: (a) Makes grants for conservation/heritage/training purposes, mainly in Devon and exceptionally elsewhere. (b) Has links with the University of Canterbury, New Zealand.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Total income: £57,449
Total expenditure: £68,906

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 September 1988: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHARLES DAVID TORLESSE Chair
None on record
Helen Torlesse Trustee 13 October 2018
None on record
JANET MITCHELL Trustee
KEVICC Awards Foundation Trust
Received: 47 days late
THE CHARITY OF DOUGLAS WILLIAM MITCHELL
Received: 22 days late
THE WAKEFIELD ALMSHOUSES CHARITY
Received: On time
DR TOM MITCHELL Trustee
THE D W MITCHELL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
MR EDD MITCHELL Trustee
THE D W MITCHELL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
JOHN CHARLES TORLESSE Trustee
NATURAL CAMBRIDGESHIRE
Received: On time
JACK HUMPHRY BARING WAKEFIELD Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £66.00k £47.52k £53.00k £51.76k £57.45k
Total expenditure £65.66k £59.13k £67.94k £129.82k £68.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 05 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 05 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 09 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 09 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 05 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 05 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 22 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 22 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 31 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 31 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE COACH HOUSE
STATION ROAD
SOUTH BRENT
TQ10 9BB
Phone:
01392581580
Website:

No information available