Financial history THE MITSUBISHI UFJ TRUST OXFORD FOUNDATION

Charity number: 800152
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £3.17k £14.39k £10.34k £9.61k £19.51k
Total expenditure £10.00k £10.76k £20.33k £63 £60
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A