THE LEVY FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity makes donations to a wide variety of charitable causes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 April 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THE LORD LEVY | Chair | 22 February 1988 |
|
|
||||||
JULIET BELLA LEVY | Trustee | 26 February 2013 |
|
|
||||||
LADY GILDA LEVY | Trustee | 22 February 1988 |
|
|||||||
DANIEL EDWARD LEVY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £100.00k | £1.85k | £3.20k | £3.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.93k | £51.14k | £36.01k | £37.40k | £35.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 14 March 2024 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF SETTLEMENT DATED 22ND FEBRUARY 1988
Charitable objects
TO OR FOR THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF ALL OR ANY ONE OR MORE TO THE EXCLUSION OF THE OTHERS OR OTHER OF THE CHARITIES OR SUCH OR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTEDISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Marylebone Mews
LONDON
W1G 8PU
- Phone:
- 02074875174
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window