Financial history Family Holiday Charity

Charity Number: 800262
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £1.93m £719.55k £1.77m £2.10m £940.41k
Total expenditure £1.20m £1.31m £2.26m £1.66m £1.26m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £933.88k £487.51k £11.23k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.85m £717.11k £1.77m £2.08m £900.47k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £8.27k £2.44k £4.19k £9.35k £24.06k
Income - Other £73.63k £0 £0 £11.05k £15.88k
Income - Legacies £1.09m £143.94k £20.23k £890.77k £132.16k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £639.20k £928.61k £1.72m £1.20m £731.63k
Expenditure - Raising funds £562.99k £376.69k £540.02k £459.19k £529.30k
Expenditure - Governance £23.44k £20.64k £16.64k £17.99k £33.59k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0