CARE IN EAST GRINSTEAD AND LINGFIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Care is a charitable organisation set up in 1988 by a group of local churches to help people in East Grinstead and Lingfield as a 'good neighbour'. Care assists in a variety of ways, with shopping or collecting prescriptions or something a bit heavier, such as moving a piece of furniture. Most requests are for transport, for those who are unable to get help in other ways.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
59 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Surrey
- West Sussex
Governance
- 21 November 1988: Standard registration
- CARE IN EAST GRINSTEAD (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael James Breen | Chair | 15 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Shepherd | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Jones | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Grant Pyner | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Susan Elizabeth Bland | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
ELISABETH WOOLLEY | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN COLLINGE | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
JAMES MUNRO | Trustee | 21 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Valeria Martinelli | Trustee | 08 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Myra Keats | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Bruce Deacon | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARY DEACON | Trustee | 26 January 2014 |
|
|||||
Zerelda Lilias Micallef | Trustee | 26 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM GODFREY BRADBURY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.41k | £4.89k | £13.08k | £16.16k | £15.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.04k | £4.63k | £11.32k | £12.92k | £16.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07 SEP 1988 AS AMENDED ON 27 APR 1993 AS AMENDED ON 07 MAY 2014 AS AMENDED ON 05 MAY 2015 AS AMENDED ON 17 MAY 2017 AS AMENDED ON 15 MAY 2019 AS AMENDED ON 21 JAN 2020 AS AMENDED ON 29 SEP 2021 as amended on 04 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
2. Objects 2.1. The objects for which CARE is established are to relieve in cases of need, hardship or distress, eligible persons (subject to the conditions in Paragraph 2.2) who are resident in the area of or adjacent to the district of East Grinstead in the County of Sussex and Lingfield in the County of Surrey or such enlarged area as the Annual General Meeting may determine, by the provision of such voluntary care and work as may be charitable and in furtherance of these objects but not otherwise, the organisation shall have the following powers:- (a) to provide help in the home to those who through age or infirmity are unable fully to support themselves. Such help may include companionship, gardening and similar practical activities; (b) to provide transport so that eligible people who otherwise would be unable to get out to do their own shopping, collect prescriptions, visit hospitals, clinics, surgeries, visit a friend or relative in a hospital or care/nursing home, or who have other basic needs may do so without feeling a burden on their immediate neighbours; (c) to undertake visiting/befriending in the clients home; (d) to assist and complement other voluntary charitable and state organisations when requested and to give assistance without hindering such organisations or taking away the primary objective for which they have been established; (e) to raise funds and to invite and receive contributions from any person or persons whatsoever by way of subscriptions and otherwise provided that the organisation shall not undertake permanent trading activities in raising funds for its objectives; (f) subject to such consents as may be required by law to sell, let or mortgage, dispose of or turn to account all or any of the property or assets of the organisation and to invest such property, money, assets, securities, shares or other investments as the Committee from time to time shall in their absolute discretion determine; (g) to do all such other things as shall further the charitable objects of the organisation and as may be lawful. 2.2. Regrettably, for legal and/or health & safety reasons, the following persons will not be eligible for transport provision by CARE:- (a) unaccompanied persons under the age of 18; Adopted 7th September 1988 as Amended 29 th September 2021 Page 2 of 5 As agreed at CARE Annual General Meeting 29 th September 2021 (b) children excluded by law from travelling in a private car without a correctly fitted child or booster seat; (c) persons whose disabilities prevent them from correctly wearing a seat belt; (d) persons whose disabilities prevent them from getting into, or out of, a private car without undue physical assistance, unless accompanied at all times by a qualified nurse or care worker; (e) persons who require physical assistance to reach a car from their residence or who are unable to get into, or out of a wheelchair without undue physical assistance, unless accompanied at all times by a qualified nurse or care worker; (f) persons with degenerative illnesses whose actions may be a danger to themselves, their driver or other road users while travelling in a private car, unless accompanied and supervised at all times by a qualified nurse or care worker; (g) persons with a history of abuse (physical or verbal); (h) persons who are involved in claims against CARE or any of its members for as long as the situation remains outstanding.
Area of benefit
IN OR ADJACENT TO EAST GRINSTEAD
Contact information
- Address:
-
2nd Floor
Crown House
37 High Street
EAST GRINSTEAD
West Sussex
- Phone:
- 01342410086
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window