R B K SCHOOLS CHRISTIAN WORKER TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The workers of the charity run collective worship meetings, RE lessons, Bible Clubs and discussion groups in a number of primary and secondary schools in the Borough of Kingston upon Thames with the object of furthering the Christian faith amongst young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Kingston Upon Thames
- Richmond Upon Thames
Governance
- 19 April 1989: Standard registration
- INSIGHT (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pim Piers | Chair | 15 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Soon Bee Ong | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Simpson | Trustee | 15 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne Underwood | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maria James | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR RAY JAMES | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £152.48k | £206.58k | £110.17k | £158.19k | £105.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £139.95k | £145.48k | £100.95k | £140.14k | £151.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 September 2024 | 234 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 September 2024 | 234 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 April 2023 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 April 2023 | 87 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED THE 29TH MARCH 1989
Charitable objects
(A) THE PROCLAMATION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE GOSPEL OF GOD CONCERNING HIS SON JESUS CHRIST OUR LORD AND THE PREACHING AND TEACHING OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND CHRISTIAN TRUTH AND STANDARDS IN AROUND AND NEAR R B K AND SURREY AND ELSEWHERE AND PARTICULARY IN SCHOOLS. (B) THE ORGANISATION SPONSORSHIP PROMOTION FURTHERING AND SUPPORT OF CHRISTIANITY IN AROUND AND NEAR R B K AND SURREY AND ELSEWHERE AND PARTICULARY IN SCHOOL WITH A VIEW (INTER ALIA) TO PRESENT TO MEN AND WOMEN YOUNG PEOPLE AND CHILDREN THE LORD JESUS CHRIST AS SAVIOUR AND LORD BY ALL POSSIBLE MEANS AND TO ENCOURAGE ATTENDANCE OF CHRISTIAN CHURCHES AND SCHOOLS CHRISTIAN UNIONS
Area of benefit
ROYAL BOROUGH OF KINGSTON UPON THAMES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Berrylands Christian Centre
41 King Charles Road
SURBITON
Surrey
KT5 8PF
- Phone:
- 07890722468
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window