THE ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOPRIC OF THE FORCES (GB)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity promotes and provides such charitable works as to advance the Roman Catholic religion among, or in connection with, members of her Majesty's Forces and their families. This includes the maintenance and support of the person holding the office of Bishop of the Forces
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 April 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Sharkey | Trustee | 02 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Robert Constantin Matau | Trustee | 02 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Ian Michael Crabtree | Trustee | 16 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev David Skillen | Trustee | 11 July 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rt Rev Paul James Mason | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
CHRISTOPHER PAUL THORPE | Trustee | 07 June 2018 |
|
|||||||||||
Matthew Alan Cadman | Trustee | 25 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £167.04k | £187.22k | £184.89k | £184.37k | £217.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £159.47k | £167.14k | £177.22k | £189.56k | £224.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 13 DEC 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROMOTE AND PROVIDE SUCH CHARITABLE WORKS AS TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION AMONG OR IN CONNECTION WITH MEMBERS OF HER MAJESTY'S FORCES AND THEIR FAMILIES INCLUDING THE MAINTENANCE AND SUPPORT OF THE PERSON FOR THE TIME BEING HOLDING THE OFFICE OR APPOINTMENT OF ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOP OF THE FORCES AND TO PROVIDE FOR AND MAINTAIN A HOUSE FOR SUCH PERSON AND OFFICES FOR HIS USE AND ANY STAFF RESPONSIBLE TO HIM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BISHOPRIC OF THE FORCES
St. Omer Barracks
Thornhill Road
ALDERSHOT
GU11 2BG
- Phone:
- 01252348234
- Email:
- diane.restall654@mod.gov.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window