Financial history CHRISTIAN BOOKS, DUNSTABLE

Charity number: 801449
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £60.49k £34.80k £20.20k £17.70k £13.64k
Total expenditure £59.15k £27.42k £32.24k £35.52k £19.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A