CHRISTIAN BOOKS, DUNSTABLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the Christian faith mainly through the sale of literature and other related items within the community and support Christian churches with literature
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bedford
- Buckinghamshire
- Central Bedfordshire
- Hertfordshire
- Luton
Governance
- 03 May 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clifford Alan Thomas Wade | Chair | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Ruth Coleman | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Caroline Mary Norman | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rex Andrews | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN WOODRUFF | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.49k | £34.80k | £20.20k | £17.70k | £13.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.15k | £27.42k | £32.24k | £35.52k | £19.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 01 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20TH MARCH 1989 as amended on 16 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING BY SELLING AND DISTRIBUTING CHRISTIAN LITERATURE AND OTHER RELIGIOUS ARTICLES.
Area of benefit
DUNSTABLE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Christian Books
St. Marys Gate
DUNSTABLE
LU6 3SW
- Phone:
- 01582 601945
- Email:
- books@christianbooks.uk.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window