THE THOMAS LAYTON COLLECTION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Catalogue and promote interest and support in the Thomas Layton Collection. To maintain collection. Support research of collection items
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Hounslow
Governance
- 15 June 1989: Standard registration
- THE LAYTON MEMORIAL AND MUSEUM TRUST (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof. JAMES WISDOM | Chair | 20 February 2012 |
|
|||||||||
GERALD ALEXANDER RICHARD MCGREGOR | Trustee | 05 August 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Phillip Rhys Williams | Trustee | 31 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Salman Haroun Shaheen | Trustee | 31 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Junue Meah | Trustee | 31 May 2022 |
|
|||||||||
ALEXANDER JAMES MARSHALL | Trustee | 29 October 2019 |
|
|||||||||
HOWARD SIMMONS | Trustee | 21 October 2013 |
|
|||||||||
JON COTTON | Trustee | 21 October 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
JANET MCNAMARA | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.06k | £4.66k | £4.30k | £7.59k | £6.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.47k | £2.48k | £2.21k | £4.31k | £8.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 4TH OCTOBER 1985
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLICE IN THE OBJECTS OF NATURAL HISTORY, AND ARCHAEOLOGY AND SCIENCE BY THE PUBLIC EXHIBITION OF A COLLECTION OF OBJECTS, SPECIMENS, BOOKS AND PRINTS OF ANTIGUITY, NATURAL HISTORY, ART, ARCHAEOLOGY AND SCIENCE AND THE EXTENSION, ENHANCEMENT, CONSERVATION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE SAID COLLECTION.
Area of benefit
HOUNSLOW LB
Contact information
- Address:
-
London Borough Of Hounslow
Hounslow House
7 Bath Road
HOUNSLOW
TW3 3EB
- Phone:
- 02085832067
- Email:
- info@thomaslayton.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window