The Cathedrals Group of Universities

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal objectives of the Council are to advance and develop public education in the Universities and Colleges that have a denominational character as defined in the Further and Higher Education Act, 1992 and to support the churches continuing role in higher education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 June 1989: Standard registration
- CATHEDRALS GROUP (Working name)
- CCUC (Working name)
- COUNCIL OF CHURCH AND ASSOCIATED COLLEGES OF HIGHER EDUCATION (Previous name)
- COUNCIL OF CHURCH COLLEGES (Previous name)
- COUNCIL OF CHURCH COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES (Previous name)
- COUNCIL OF CHURCH UNIVERSITIES AND COLLEGES (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Shreeve | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Professor Sarah Greer | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Professor Claire Margaret Philippa Ozanne | Trustee | 29 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Anthony McClaran | Trustee | 25 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Professor Jacqueline Dunne | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Professor Jean-Noel Ezingeard | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Professor Julie Mennell | Trustee | 24 November 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Paul Barber | Trustee | 08 April 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.13k | £67.08k | £67.08k | £69.10k | £70.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £96.87k | £88.33k | £34.87k | £51.46k | £64.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 06 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 06 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/01/1988 AS AMENDED ON 02/11/1989 AS AMENDED ON 10/03/1990 AS AMENDED ON 21/11/2000 AS AMENDED ON 20/11/2008 AS AMENDED ON 29/11/2012 AS AMENDED ON 21/11/2013 AS AMENDED ON 30/10/2014 AS AMENDED ON 12/11/2015 AS AMENDED ON 24 NOV 2016 as amended on 28 Mar 2023 as amended on 22 Sep 2023 as amended on 21 Mar 2025
Charitable objects
To advance and develop higher education in the Church Universities, Universities with Church Foundations and other Universities admitted into membership of the Cathedrals Group and to support the Churches’ continuing role in higher education
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o University Of Cumbria
Fusehill Street
CARLISLE
CA1 2HH
- Phone:
- 01228 616234
- Email:
- ANDREW.HERON@CUMBRIA.AC.UK
- Website:
-
cathedralsgroup.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window