THE ANN DRIVER TRUST

Charity number: 801898
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Ann Driver Trust was founded in June 1989, in memory of Ann Driver MBE, musician and broadcaster. It supports the education of youth in the arts, with special emphasis on music, by giving grants to nominated schools and colleges.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £29,815
Total expenditure: £43,991

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 August 1989: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROBERT PRITCHETT Chair
None on record
Daisy Vatalaro Trustee 08 June 2022
None on record
Sophia Rahman Trustee 11 June 2014
None on record
KATHLEEN DUNCAN Trustee 25 April 2011
None on record
ALASDAIR WILSON ROBERTSON TAIT Trustee
Britten Pears Arts
Received: On time
COUNTESS OF MUNSTER MUSICAL TRUST
Received: On time
TIMOTHY GREY WAKELEY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £29.88k £35.00k £31.80k £28.41k £29.82k
Total expenditure £30.38k £36.94k £41.56k £41.28k £43.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 10 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 10 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 28 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 28 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 14 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 14 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 11 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 11 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 23 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 23 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE ROYAL SOCIETY OF MUSICIANS
26 Fitzroy Square
LONDON
W1T 6BT
Phone:
07957 203241