Financial history THE NORFOLK GARDENS TRUST

Charity number: 801984
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £11.14k £31.60k £44.07k £23.02k £20.87k
Total expenditure £12.20k £27.81k £39.47k £28.25k £21.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A