Financial history CHASDEI KOHN

Charity number: 801989
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £18.98k £34.19k £29.84k £33.87k £3.64k
Total expenditure £31.06k £37.79k £10.35k £23.03k £12.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A