Financial history STREATHAM CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity Number: 802195
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £25.76k £3.36k £37.99k £52.41k £58.97k
Total expenditure £20.26k £4.43k £35.69k £44.49k £62.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A