THE MORRIS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Morris Charitable Trust has been established as a trust since 1989 to provide support for charitable causes. It is funded by companies within BDCG Holdings Limited, which contribute a proportion of their profits to facilitate theTrust's charitable activities. Particular emphasis is placed on supporting charitable causes within The London Borough of Islington.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 November 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JACK ANTHONY MORRIS CBE | Chair |
|
||||||
MARC MORRIS | Trustee | 03 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
CARLY KING | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
KATE VANDENBURG | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
LUCIE KATIE GRANT | Trustee | 19 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
LINDA MORRIS | Trustee | 22 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
DOMINIC RICHARD JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL BARRY MORRIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.44k | £100.07k | £100.01k | £160.31k | £151.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £142.28k | £139.61k | £154.87k | £141.70k | £152.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17TH OCTOBER 1989
Charitable objects
(A) TO RELIEVE THE POOR SICK AND AGED; (B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; AND (C) TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE BUSINESS DESIGN CENTRE
52 UPPER STREET
ISLINGTON GREEN
LONDON
N1 0QH
- Phone:
- 02073593535
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window