ADVOCACY PARTNERS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advocacy Partners promotes the Rights, Voices and Choices of people with learning disabilities, older people, and people with physical disabilities or mental health needs. It provides independent advocacy to enable people to have control over their lives, make decisions, be treated fairly and participate fully in community life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 27 November 1989: Standard registration
- 26 October 2018: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 26 October 2018: Funds transferred to 1076630 VOICEABILITY ADVOCACY
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 25 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 19 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 24 February 2016 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26TH OCTOBER 1989 AND AMENDED 24TH NOVEMBER 2003.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE ASSISTANCE, ADVICE, REPRESENTATION AND SERVICES WHICH WILL DIRECTLY RELIEVE THE NEED OF PERSONS WHO ARE (A) SUFFERING FROM MENTAL ILL HEALTH OR SERIOUS PHYSICAL ILLNESS OR (B) WITH A MENTAL OR PHYSICAL DISABILITY, OR (C) WHO ARE ELDERLY AND IN NEED. (SEE MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION FOR FURTHER DETAILS)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window