THE FRIENDS OF THE SPAFFORD CHILDREN'S CENTER OF JERUSALEM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FSCC raises money for the advancement of the charitable work carried on at the Spafford Childrens Center of Jerusalem in the state of Israel, being a centre providing care, treatment and education to children. All money raised is sent to SCC except the small proportion spent on administration and book keeping.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

19 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Israel
Governance
- 13 February 1990: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF THE SPAFFORD CHILDREN'S CENTER OF EAST JERUSALEM (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FRANK SPENCER-NAIRN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Lucinda C L Lopresti | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophia Lopresti | Trustee | 15 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Connie Musallam | Trustee | 09 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sara Bristow | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|||||
DAVID CAUSER | Trustee | 21 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kim Ingleby | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary Partridge | Trustee | 07 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rosie Ingleby | Trustee | 20 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Pippa Sentance | Trustee | 20 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
BECKETT VESTER | Trustee | 05 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
JACOB DAJANI | Trustee | 05 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
DOUGLAS SPENCER-NAIRN | Trustee | 05 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
LADY DJEMILA LOVELL COPE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NICK VESTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ABIR TUQAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SAID SHEHADEH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR AHMED MASSOUD MD | Trustee |
|
||||||
TESSA INGLEBY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.60k | £80.30k | £54.27k | £67.81k | £74.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.81k | £50.09k | £139.10k | £79.72k | £63.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31ST OCTOBER 1989
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHARITABLE WORK NOW CARRIED ON AT THE SPAFFORD CHILDRENS' CENTER OF JERUSALEM, BEING A CENTER FOR THE CARE AND TREATMENT OF SICK CHILDREN AND INFANT WELFARE CENTER.
Area of benefit
JERUSALEM
Contact information
- Address:
-
ELIZABETH COURT
17 TRYON CRESCENT
London
London
E9 7RY
- Phone:
- 02079677015
- Email:
- spafford.uk@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window