DEPAUL UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To offer homeless and disadvantaged young people the opportunity to fulfill their potential and move towards a positive and independent future
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£20,306,000
Donations and legacies | £1.17m | |
Charitable activities | £14.93m | |
Other trading activities | £4.18m | |
Investments | £24.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£21,935,000
Raising funds | £1.55m | |
Charitable activities | £20.38m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £8,662,791 from 44 government contract(s) and £571,585 from 7 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.55m | |
Charitable expenditure | £20.38m |
People

308 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
727 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£80k to £90k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 November 1989: Standard registration
- 18 October 2018: Funds received from 1098980 SAFE @ LAST
- THE DEPAUL TRUST (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SANDEEP KATWALA | Chair | 01 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Jane Mickel | Trustee | 05 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kyla Kirkpatrick | Trustee | 23 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Allee Bonnard | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Thomas James | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sister Maureen Anne Tinkler | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Urvashi Bhagat | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Anthony Ian Hellawell | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Eugene Patrick Curran | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.07m | £16.45m | £18.53m | £17.96m | £20.31m | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.30m | £16.86m | £18.28m | £18.65m | £21.94m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £5.03m | £5.93m | £6.58m | £6.64m | £8.66m | |
|
Income from government grants | £450.48k | £108.58k | £220.20k | £346.45k | £571.59k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.23m | £2.29m | £2.04m | £5.48m | £1.17m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £102.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £4.18m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £10.83m | £11.57m | £13.69m | £12.48m | £14.93m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £6.00k | £4.00k | £4.00k | £1.00k | £24.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £2.90m | £2.59m | £2.80m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £237.00k | £132.00k | £391.00k | £578.00k | £329.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £14.61m | £14.90m | £16.76m | £17.06m | £20.38m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.69m | £1.96m | £1.52m | £1.59m | £1.55m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £43.00k | £44.00k | £33.00k | £44.00k | £47.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £3.70m | £3.47m | £3.29m | £4.35m | £4.66m | |
|
Long-term investments | £92.00k | £93.00k | £93.00k | £130.00k | £83.00k | |
|
Other assets | £6.58m | £6.77m | £7.02m | £6.59m | £5.55m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £2.17m | £2.54m | £2.36m | £2.41m | £3.27m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6TH NOVEMBER 1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED ON 25TH FEBRUARY 1990, 23RD FEBRUARY 1998, 2ND NOVEMBER 1998, 8TH SEPTEMBER 2003, 29 NOVEMBER 2004 AND 8 JUNE 2009. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09 MAR 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22 SEP 2018 as amended on 22 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
The Objects of the Charity are:- 1. the prevention and relief of poverty, homelessness and financial hardship; 2. the advancement of education; 3. such other exclusively charitable objects or exclusively charitable purposes as the trustees may from time to time decide can usefully be pursued for the public benefit, nationally and internationally and by such exclusively charitable means as the trustees may determine (the "objects"). Nothing in the articles shall authorise an application of the property of the charity for purposes which are not charitable in accordance with section 7 of the Charities and Trustee Investment (Scotland) Act 2005.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Depaul UK
Sherborne House
34-36 Decima Street
LONDON
SE1 4QQ
- Phone:
- 02079391220
- Email:
- depaul@depaulcharity.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window