Financial history THE NIMBUS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 802708
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £53.31k £28.91k £80.55k £54.17k £44.81k
Total expenditure £97.46k £107.61k £98.64k £111.29k £83.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £6.67k £18.00k N/A N/A