D J H CURRIE MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Absolute discretion to charities in Essex. No recipient may benefit more than once every four years. Trust is open to applications. Please submit your application to https://funding.ludlowtrust.com
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 11 July 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Essex
Governance
- 05 March 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 11/07/2020 | 11/07/2021 | 11/07/2022 | 11/07/2023 | 11/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.68k | £21.84k | £33.20k | £33.01k | £49.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.21k | £53.59k | £55.29k | £50.25k | £20.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 11 July 2024 | 19 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 July 2024 | 19 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 11 July 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 July 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 11 July 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 July 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 11 July 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 11 July 2020 | 11 June 2021 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 July 2020 | 11 June 2021 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED IPSWICH PR ON 1ST JULY 1975
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS IN ESSEX AS THE BANK MAY IN ITS ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SELECT AND TO PAY THE INCOME THEREOF TO OR FOR SUCH INSTITUTIONS OR OBJECTS IF MORE THAN ONE IN SUCH PROPORTION AS THE BANK MAY THINK PROPER.
Area of benefit
ESSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ludlow Trust Co Ltd
Tower Wharf
Cheese Lane
BRISTOL
BS2 0JJ
- Phone:
- 01173138200
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window