THE CHRISTIAN AND MISSIONARY ALLIANCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote the Christian Faith in all parts of the world. Supporting church planting in the UK and abroard. Undertaking humanitarian aid within the framework of Chritianity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cardiff
- Harrow
- Hertfordshire
- Leeds City
- Leicestershire
- Manchester City
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- Suffolk
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Mongolia
- Spain
Governance
- 09 March 1990: Standard registration
- THE C AND MA (GB) (Working name)
- THE CMA (GB) (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexis Wai Kuen Chung | Trustee | 29 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev DAVID TURPIN | Trustee | 15 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Rev MARK SHARMAN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.34k | £65.50k | £65.50k | £56.00k | £201.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.92k | £58.98k | £58.98k | £56.55k | £157.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 04 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 04 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12TH DECEMBER 1989
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ALL PARTS OF THE WORLD IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STATEMENT.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDON AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
BLAKELAW COMMUNITY CHURCH
CRAGSTON WAY
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE5 3SW
- Phone:
- 01332756609
- Email:
- admin@cmalliance.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window