WALTHAM FOREST DYSLEXIA ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Waltham Forest Dyslexia Association provides information on dyslexia which can be accessed via our helpline, our website or by emailing us. We also: - run literacy numeracy handwriting & touch typing classes - run training and conferences - provide information and training about dyslexia to schools - offer computer screening - monthly adult group
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barking And Dagenham
- Essex
- Hackney
- Haringey
- Newham
- Redbridge
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 10 July 1990: Standard registration
- W F D A (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sadia Mirza | Trustee | 14 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Daniel McMenemy | Trustee | 16 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Carol Ann Newnham | Trustee | 31 January 2014 |
|
|||||
Dr KATHERINE HEWLETT | Trustee | 17 June 2011 |
|
|||||
ELEANOR JANE PEARCE | Trustee |
|
||||||
Katherine Elizabeth Marshall | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90.64k | £66.00k | £46.05k | £45.47k | £37.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.11k | £64.98k | £56.58k | £58.45k | £48.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 26 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 26 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07 NOV 1989 AS AMENDED ON 11 JUL 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS WHO ARE DYSLEXIC, PROVIDE SUPPORT AND INFORMATION, AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC TO MAKE SOCIETY MORE DYSLEXIC-FRIENDLY BY: A) BUILDING UPON PARTNERSHIPS AND COLLABORATIVE WORK TO ENABLE DYSLEXIC PEOPLE OF ALL AGES TO REACH THEIR FULL POTENTIAL. B) SUPPORTING THE NEEDS OF DYSLEXIC CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS TO HELP THEM IMPROVE THEIR CONFIDENCE, INDEPENDENCE AND WELL-BEING BY PROVIDING ACCESSIBLE, AFFORDABLE, QUALITY SERVICES RUN BY APPROPRIATELY TRAINED STAFF. C) PROMOTING AND ENCOURAGING RESEARCH INTO DYSLEXIA BY PROVIDING EVIDENCE BASED DATA TO SUPPORT QUALITY SERVICES AND DISSEMINATE THE RESULTS THEREOF. D) PROCURING AND PROVIDING ADVICE AND INFORMATION TO THE PUBLIC CONCERNING DYSLEXIA E) RAISING AWARENESS OF THE NEEDS OF DYSLEXIC PEOPLE BY HOLDING PUBLIC EXHIBITIONS, MEETINGS AND LECTURES. F) DOING ALL SUCH OTHER LAWFUL THINGS AS MAY BE NECESSARY FOR THE ATTAINMENT OF THE SAID OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
WALTHAM FOREST
Contact information
- Address:
-
63 RUBY ROAD
LONDON
E17 4RE
- Phone:
- 020 8520 1684
- Email:
- admin@wfda.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window