FIRST STOP CENTRE (MID-ESSEX BRANCH)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the condition of disadvantaged persons in mid-Essex experiencing difficulties with homelessness, joblessness, substance misuse, physical and mental health problems, learning difficulties by the provision of support services to assist them in maintaining normal relationships with and within their community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £45,440 from 3 government contract(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 06 April 1990: Standard registration
- 30 December 2024: Funds received from 1174985 TALK, LISTEN, CARE
- FIRST STOP CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michelle Lee | Chair | 16 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Robert Draper | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Radley | Trustee | 04 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Emma Claire Reid-Carter | Trustee | 12 February 2005 |
|
|
||||
MOIA THOROGOOD | Trustee | 02 February 2004 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.03k | £122.95k | £156.03k | £82.18k | £102.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.95k | £49.72k | £95.02k | £102.68k | £120.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £41.68k | £45.44k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £38.16k | £4.10k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/11/1989 AS AMENDED ON 18/06/2007 AS AMENDED ON 06/07/2012
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE CONDITION OF DISADVANTAGED PERSONS IN MID-ESSEX EXPERIENCING DIFFICULTIES WITH HOMELESSNESS, JOBLESSNESS, SUBSTANCE MISUSE, PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH AND RELATED PROBLEMS, LEARNING DISABILITIES BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT SERVICES FOR SUCH PERSONS TO ASSIST THEM IN MAINTAINING NORMAL RELATIONSHIPS WITH AND WITHIN THE COMMUNITY IN WHICH THEY RESIDE.
Area of benefit
MID ESSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
First Stop Centre
29 Bocking End
BRAINTREE
CM7 9AE
- Phone:
- 01376 346535
- Website:
-
firststopcentre.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window