THE MICHAEL DAVIE RESEARCH FOUNDATION

Charity number: 803202
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Grants are made to other charities and / or voluntary bodies to fund medical research. We raise funding by receiving donations from both individuals and societies as well as from income we receive from our investments and occasionally by encashing a small part of our investments.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £23,199
Total expenditure: £23,818

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 January 1998: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • THE MICHAEL DAVIE RESEARCH FUND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DR MICHAEL WILLIAM JOHN DAVIE MD, FRCP Chair 19 October 2012
DAVIE BARNSTAPLE TRUST
Received: On time
Michael John Haddaway Trustee 22 March 2022
SHREWSBURY FOOD HUB
Received: On time
Teresa Johnson Trustee 21 March 2018
None on record
DR CHRIS SHARP Trustee 27 October 2013
None on record
Maldwyn Jones BSC ACIB Trustee 19 October 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £17.37k £16.36k £16.55k £19.15k £23.20k
Total expenditure £39.34k £30.74k £19.46k £36.94k £23.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 20 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 02 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 AUGUST 1997
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION REGARDING BONE DISEASE AND TO RELIEVE SICKNESS THROUGH BONE DISEASE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 30 January 1998 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Manaros
3 Holborn
High Street
Nefyn
Gwynedd
LL53 6HD
Phone:
01758721658
Website:

Michaeldavieresearchfoundation.comm.uk