THE WILLIAM ALWYN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 803294
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The object of the charity is to promote the education of the public in the study, practice, knowledge and appreciation of music, more particularly the music of William Alwyn, by encouraging, promoting and assisting in the publication, performance and recording of the music of William Alwyn.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £46,349
Total expenditure: £37,257

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 June 1990: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Leah Colette Broad Trustee 23 February 2023
None on record
Margaret Ann Jones Trustee 10 February 2022
RAWSTHORNE TRUST
Received: On time
ANDREW PETER KNOWLES Trustee 30 June 2021
RAWSTHORNE TRUST
Received: On time
Lloyd Colin Moore Trustee 01 May 2018
None on record
Prof Richard Ramsden Trustee 16 December 2014
None on record
PHILIP RAMSBOTTOM Trustee 16 December 2014
THE GRANADA FOUNDATION
Recently registered
ANDREW PHILIP PALMER Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF KEMP TOWN: SAINT MARY
Received: On time
JOHN STANLEY GIBBONS Trustee
THE BRITISH MUSIC SOCIETY
Received: 136 days late
RICHARD MICHAEL ANDREWES Trustee
THE RISM (UK) TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £58.45k £40.74k £49.94k £54.23k £46.35k
Total expenditure £171.76k £50.21k £115.30k £26.14k £37.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 28 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 06 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 06 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 28 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 28 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 07 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 07 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Garden Flat
15 Clarendon Gardens
LONDON
W9 1AY
Phone:
02072864012