Financial history THE MERLIN TRUST

Charity number: 803441
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £28.37k £38.12k £28.09k £30.41k £24.10k
Total expenditure £54.78k £13.21k £16.43k £19.92k £38.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A