Financial history THE SHUTTLEWOOD CLARKE FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 803525
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £353.48k £177.85k £223.54k £325.25k £386.51k
Total expenditure £438.89k £242.39k £310.87k £402.47k £488.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £44.40k £1.71k N/A N/A