Register of Charities - The Charity Commission THE SOCIETY OF JESUS CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity number: 1207742-4
Removed charity
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 11 JUNE 1990, DEED OF APPOINTMENT OF NEW TRUSTEES OF 12 JUNE 1990 AND ORDER OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 5 MAY 2005.
TRUST DEED AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 11 JAN 0225
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 11 JAN 2025
Charitable objects
PROMOTION OF THE CHARITABLE WORK FOR THE TIME BEING CARRIED ON PROMOTED OR SUPPORTED BY THE SOCIETY OF JESUS (IN PARTICULAR BY THE BRITISH PROVINCE THEREOF) BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION WITH THE CONSENT OF THE PROVINCIAL OF THE BRITISH PROVINCE FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Registration history
- 27 June 1990: Standard registration
- 05 November 2008: Removed
- 05 November 2008: Funds transferred to 230165 SOCIETY OF JESUS TRUST OF 1929 FOR ROMAN CATHOLIC ...
Other names
- SOCIETY OF JESUS (Working name)
- TRUSTEES FOR ROMAN CATHOLIC PURPOSES REGISTERED (INCORPORATED BODY OF TRUSTEES) (Working name)
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.