Financial history THE LITTLEGARTH COTTAGES TRUST

Charity number: 803788
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 27/06/2020 27/06/2021 27/06/2022 27/06/2023 27/06/2024
Total gross income £37.70k £28.30k £32.49k £32.87k £34.14k
Total expenditure £26.57k £32.18k £4.24k £6.15k £10.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A